WA HB1179 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revising the lien for collection of sewer charges by counties.
Title
Revising the lien for collection of sewer charges by counties.
Sponsors
Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] | Rep. David Sawyer [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 5:30 PM. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2014-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-01-24 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2013-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-01-31 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2013-01-31 | House | LG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5218 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.