WA HB1067 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progress, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing fiscal notes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing fiscal notes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-11 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2012-04-04 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2012-01-09 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-11-28 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-04-26 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-01-10 First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2011-01-05 Prefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback