WA HB1047 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state agencies continuity of operations planning requirements.
Title
Concerning state agencies continuity of operations planning requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-04-23 | House | Chapter 61, 2015 Laws. |
2015-04-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-17 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | GOS - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |
2015-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 81; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-19 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-19 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-01-20 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2015-01-20 | House | PS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-01-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2014-12-17 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5020 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.