WA HB1022 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting general power of attorney provisions in bail bond agreements.
Title
Prohibiting general power of attorney provisions in bail bond agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-03-31 | House | Chapter 73, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2016-02-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2015-03-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-01-23 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2015-01-23 | House | PS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2014-12-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |