WA HB1007 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting the use of automated traffic safety cameras to detect speed violations not in school zones to certain cities.
Title
Limiting the use of automated traffic safety cameras to detect speed violations not in school zones to certain cities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-13 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-01-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-01-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-01-26 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2015-01-26 | House | TR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2014-12-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5336 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1007&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1007.pdf |