VT JRH022 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-3)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Senate Message, Adopted in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-3)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Senate Message, Adopted in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Authorizing The Use Of The State House On June 18, 2014 For The 2014 Green Mountain Girls State Day
Title
Joint Resolution Authorizing The Use Of The State House On June 18, 2014 For The 2014 Green Mountain Girls State Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | Senate Message, Adopted in concurrence |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Adopted in concurrence |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Joint Resolutions for Adoption |
2014-04-24 | Senate | New Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51 |
2014-04-22 | House | Adopted |
2014-04-18 | House | Read First Time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52 |