VT H0406 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Signed by Governor on 5/8/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Signed by Governor on 5/8/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Town Listers, Assessors And Auditors
Title
An Act Relating To Town Listers, Assessors And Auditors
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Devereux [R] | Rep. Mark Higley [R] | Rep. Linda Martin [D] | Rep. Cynthia Browning [D] |
Rep. Michel Consejo [D] | Rep. Anne Mook [D] | Rep. Maida Townsend [D] | Rep. Jeff Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | Signed by Governor on 5/8/2013 |
2013-05-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on 5/8/2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2013-04-26 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2013-04-24 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2013-04-23 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator French for Committee on Government Operations |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2013-04-18 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2013-03-21 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2013-03-20 | House | Amendment of Committee on Government Operations agreed to and Third Reading Ordered |
2013-03-20 | House | Rep. Higley of Lowell reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2013-03-20 | House | Read Second Time |
2013-02-28 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |