VA SJR5017 | 2014 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ5017ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ5017ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Confirming Governor's appointments of certain persons. Confirms appointments of certain persons made by Governor McAuliffe and communicated to the General Assembly April 4, 2014.
Title
Governor; confirming appointments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 0-N) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ5017ER) |
2014-09-18 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 0-N) |
2014-09-18 | House | Agreed to by House (90-Y 0-N) |
2014-09-18 | House | Taken up |
2014-09-18 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (17-Y 0-N) |
2014-06-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-06-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 14200135D |