VA SJR163 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ163ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ163ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Equality Virginia.
Title
Commending Equality Virginia.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ163ER) |
2014-03-04 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-28 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2014-02-28 | House | Received |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Presented 14105006D |