VA SJR148 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-28 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ148ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-28 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ148ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 100th anniversary of President Thomas Woodrow Wilson's Mother's Day proclamation.
Title
Commemorating the 100th anniversary of President Thomas Woodrow Wilson's Mother's Day proclamation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ148ER) |
2014-02-28 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2014-02-21 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2014-02-21 | House | Received |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Presented 14104992D |