VA SJR119 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-14 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ119ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-14 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ119ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Luca Paschina.
Title
Commending Luca Paschina.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ119ER) |
2014-02-14 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2014-02-07 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2014-02-07 | House | Received |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Presented 14102502D |