VA SJR113 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-07 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ113ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-07 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ113ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Virginia Environmental Professionals' Organization.
Title
Commending the Virginia Environmental Professionals' Organization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ113ER) |
2014-02-07 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2014-01-31 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2014-01-31 | House | Received |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Presented 14103658D |