VA SB96 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Purchase, etc., of tobacco products by minors; nicotine vapor products and alternative nicotine products. Adds nicotine vapor products and alternative nicotine products to the list of tobacco products that cannot be sold to or purchased or possessed by a minor. The bill defines a nicotine vapor product as a noncombustible product containing nicotine that employs a heating element, power source, electronic circuit, or other means that can be used to produce vapor from nicotine in a solution or other form. The bill defines an alternative nicotine product as any noncombustible product containing nicotine that is intended for human consumption.
Title
Tobacco products; purchase, etc., of nicotine vapor products by minors, penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. John Miller [D] | Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357) | |
2014-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 357 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB96ER) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Passed House with amendment (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2014-02-24 | House | Amendment by Delegate Albo agreed to |
2014-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-17 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB96S2 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104544D-S2 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 14104039D-S1 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Incorporates SB17 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104544D-S2 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Substitute bill reprinted 14104039D-S1 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Incorporates SB17 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104039D-S1 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-12-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-12-26 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100357D |
Same As/Similar To
SB17 (Similar To) 2014-01-15 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
HB218 (Same As) 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394)
HB218 (Same As) 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394)