VA SB945 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; installment payments of cost-sharing obligations. Directs the Virginia Department of Health to convene a work group, which is to develop recommendations regarding issues relating to patient assistance programs for specialty drug needs and the authority of health insurers to move a drug to a higher cost-sharing tier or otherwise modify prescription drug coverage.
Title
Patient assistance programs; work group to develop recommendations regarding specialty drug needs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Blank Action (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Blank Action (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | House | Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2013-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB945S1 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13104516D-S1 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Incorporates SB947 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13104516D-S1 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101090D |
Same As/Similar To
SB947 (Similar To) 2013-01-28 - Incorporated by Commerce and Labor
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3447 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3452 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |