VA SB893 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0521)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0521)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Southwest Virginia Cultural Heritage Foundation. Creates the Southwest Virginia Cultural Heritage Foundation to replace the Southwest Virginia Cultural Heritage Commission, which will cease to exist on July 1, 2011. The bill sets out the membership and powers and duties of the Foundation. The bill provides that the Southwest Virginia Cultural Heritage Foundation is the successor in interest to the Southwest Virginia Cultural Heritage Commission, and further provides that members of the Commission serving terms shall continue their terms as members of the board of trustees of the Southwest Virginia Cultural Heritage Foundation. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Southwest Virginia Cultural Heritage Foundation; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0521) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 521 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB893ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2011-02-22 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-17 | House: Reported from Rules with amendments (13-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Assigned Rules sub: #1 | |
2011-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103563D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2010 (Same As) 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0548)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2734 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2737 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |