VA SB800 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Budget Bill. Amends Chapter 3, Special Session I, of the Acts of Assembly of 2014.
Title
Budget Bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment agreed to (22-Y 15-N) (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Pending question ordered (23-Y 14-N) (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Motion for Special and Continuing Order (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Pending question ordered (23-Y 14-N) (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Motion for Special and Continuing Order (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2015-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Obenshain rejected |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Miller rejected |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Marsden rejected |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.158 Item 4-4.01 #1s) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.155 Item 3-5.19 #1s) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.155 Item 3-5.18 #1s) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.155 Item 3-5.17 #1s) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.154 Item 3-5.16 #2s) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.154 Item 3-5.15 #1s) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.154 Item 3-5.14 #1s) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.138 Item C-25.60 #1s) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.110 Item 444 #1s) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.83 Item 335 #1s) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.64 Item 301 #11s) (22-Y 15-N) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Pending question ordered (23-Y 14-N) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.56 Item 290 #1s) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Uncontested committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Motion for Special and Continuing Order (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Budget amendments available |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102935D |