VA SB741 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Coalfield employment enhancement tax credit; expiration. Extends the expiration date of the credit from January 1, 2017, to January 1, 2019.
Title
Coalfield employment enhancement; extends expiration date of tax credit to January 1, 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (1-Y 34-N) (Y: 1 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (35-Y 2-N) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 27-N 1-A) (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (1-Y 34-N) (Y: 1 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (35-Y 2-N) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 27-N 1-A) (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2015-02-27 | Senate | No further action taken |
2015-02-18 | House | Delegates: Kilgore, Landes, Kory |
2015-02-18 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senators: Carrico, Wagner, Alexander |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | House requested conference committee |
2015-02-18 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2015-02-18 | Senate | House amendment rejected by Senate (1-Y 34-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (35-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 27-N 1-A) |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed House with amendment (69-Y 27-N 1-A) |
2015-02-18 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2015-02-18 | House | Amendment by Delegate O'Quinn agreed to |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2015-02-18 | House | Committee substitute rejected 15105127D-H1 |
2015-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105127D-H1 |
2015-02-16 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 7-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15101561D-E |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB741E |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101561D |