VA SB693 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Trap, neuter, and return activity. Permits a person to trap and sterilize a feral cat before returning it to the site where it was trapped. The bill excludes a participant in such an activity from the definition of "owner" regarding custody of the subject cat; under current law, abandonment of an animal by an owner is a misdemeanor.
Title
Feral cats; trapping, neutering, and returning to site activity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 10-N) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-02-09 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Agriculture |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 10-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB693S1 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104554D-S1 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 4-N 1-A) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104554D-S1 |
2014-11-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2014-11-25 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100927D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 6500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6504.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6551 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6585 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |