VA SB430 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0365)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0365)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; limited brewery license created; local regulation of certain activities. Creates a new limited brewery license for breweries that manufacture no more than 15,000 barrels of beer per calendar year, are located on a farm in the Commonwealth, and use agricultural products that are grown on the farm in the manufacture of their beer. The bill limits local regulation of limited brewery licensees and specifically prohibits the imposition of minimum parking, road access, or road upgrade requirements on any licensed limited brewery.
Title
Farm brewery licenses, limited; Board of Alcoholic Beverage Control may grant to certain breweries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 3-N) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 3-N) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0365) | |
2014-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 365 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB430ER) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Title replaced 14105051D-H1 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Passed House with substitute (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB430H1 |
2014-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14105051D-H1 |
2014-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 14105051D-H1 |
2014-02-19 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Agriculture |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 3-N) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB430S1 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104119D-S1 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (11-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104119D-S1 |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103430D |
Subjects
Agriculture, Animal Care and Food
Alcoholic Beverage Control Act
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Alcoholic Beverage Control Act
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2288.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 112.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 119 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 123 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 128 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 201.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 209.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 212.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 219.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 231 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 233 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 235 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 238 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 324 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 325.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 326 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |