VA SB398 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0818)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; outdoor advertising; penalty. Requires all outdoor advertising of alcoholic beverages to be in compliance with ABC law, ABC Board regulations, and VDOT law and regulations concerning outdoor advertising. The bill also sets the general rule that no outdoor alcoholic beverage advertising shall be placed within 500 linear feet on the same side of the road, and parallel to such road, measured from the nearest edge of the sign face upon which the advertisement is placed to the nearest edge of a building or structure located on the real property of (i) a church, synagogue, mosque, or other place of religious worship; (ii) a public, private, or parochial school, college, or university; (iii) a public or private playground or similar recreational facility; or (iv) a dwelling used for residential use. The bill provides that the provisions of ABC law relating to outdoor advertising of alcoholic beverages shall not apply to any sign that is included in the Integrated Directional Sign Program administered by the Virginia Department of Transportation or its agents. The bill sets out the penalties for violation. The bill contains technical amendments. The bill contains an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; outdoor advertising regulations, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-18 - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0818)
2012-04-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 818 (effective 4/18/12)
2012-04-18 House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
2012-04-18 Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled
2012-04-18 Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB398ER2)
2012-04-18 Senate: Reenrolled
2012-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2012-04-18 House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (94-Y 0-N)
2012-04-18 House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 0-N)
2012-04-18 Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2012-04-17 Senate: Placed on Calendar
2012-04-09 Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate
2012-02-29 Senate: Signed by President
2012-02-28 House: Signed by Speaker
2012-02-28 Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB398ER)
2012-02-28 Senate: Enrolled
2012-02-23 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2012-02-23 House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2012-02-23 House: Read third time
2012-02-22 House: Read second time
2012-02-21 House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2012-02-16 House: Referred to Committee on General Laws
2012-02-16 House: Read first time
2012-02-16 House: Placed on Calendar
2012-02-14 Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2012-02-14 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2012-02-14 Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB398S1
2012-02-14 Senate: Emergency clause added
2012-02-14 Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105210D-S1
2012-02-14 Senate: Reading of substitute waived
2012-02-14 Senate: Read second time
2012-02-13 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2012-02-10 Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105210D-S1
2012-02-10 Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
2012-01-11 Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2012-01-11 Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101168D

Same As/Similar To

HB471 (Same As) 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0760)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41320(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+sum+SB398
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+ful+SB398+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+ful+SB398S1+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+ful+SB398ER+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+ful+SB398ER2+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+ful+CHAP0818+hil
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+vot+S09V0039+SB0398
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+vot+SV0392SB0398+SB0398
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+vot+SV0424SB0398+SB0398
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+vot+SV0425SB0398+SB0398
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+vot+H11V0207+SB0398
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+vot+HV1062+SB0398
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+vot+SV1113SB0398+SB0398
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+vot+HV1660+SB0398

Bill Comments

feedback