VA SB236 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Vetoed on April 7 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-04-23 - Requires 26 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Student religious viewpoint expression. Codifies the right of students to (i) voluntarily pray or engage in religious activities or religious expression before, during, and after the school day in the same manner and to the same extent that students may engage in nonreligious activities or expression; (ii) organize prayer groups, religious clubs, "see you at the pole" gatherings, or other religious gatherings before, during, and after school to the same extent that students are permitted to organize other activities and groups; and (iii) wear clothing, accessories, or jewelry that displays religious messages or religious symbols in the same manner and to the same extent that other types of clothing, accessories, and jewelry are permitted. The bill also requires each school division to adopt a policy to permit a student speaker to express a religious viewpoint at any school event at which a student is permitted to publicly speak. The policy shall declare each such school event to be a limited public forum, provide a neutral method for the selection of student speakers, and require each school principal to provide a disclaimer in advance of each such school event that the school division does not endorse any religious viewpoint that may be expressed by student speakers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Students; codifies right to religious viewpoint expression.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-23 - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - Senate: Motion to reconsider Governor's veto agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House: Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-23SenateRequires 26 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
2014-04-23SenateSenate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 19-N)
2014-04-23SenateMotion to reconsider Governor's veto agreed to (39-Y 0-N)
2014-04-23SenateRequires 26 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
2014-04-23SenateSenate sustained Governor's veto (22-Y 17-N)
2014-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar
2014-04-07 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2014-03-03SenateSigned by President
2014-03-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2014-02-28SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB236ER)
2014-02-28SenateEnrolled
2014-02-26HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N)
2014-02-26HousePassed House (64-Y 34-N)
2014-02-26HouseRead third time
2014-02-25HouseRead second time
2014-02-24HouseReported from Education (12-Y 10-N)
2014-02-14HouseAssigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education
2014-01-24HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2014-01-24HouseRead first time
2014-01-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2014-01-21SenatePassed Senate (20-Y 18-N)
2014-01-21SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2014-01-21SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 17-N)
2014-01-20SenateRead second time and engrossed
2014-01-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2014-01-16SenateReported from Education and Health (7-Y 6-N)
2014-01-08SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2014-01-03SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2014-01-03SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100426D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221203.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221203.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+sum+SB236
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+ful+SB236+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+ful+SB236ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+vot+S04V0014+SB0236
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+vot+SV0073SB0236+SB0236
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+vot+SV0112SB0236+SB0236
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+vot+SV0119SB0236+SB0236
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+vot+SV0120SB0236+SB0236
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+vot+H09V0178+SB0236
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+vot+HV1081+SB0236
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+vot+SV0959SB0236+SB0236
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+vot+SV0961SB0236+SB0236
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+vot+SV0962SB0236+SB0236

Bill Comments

feedback