VA SB127 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0014)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0014)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Annual license tax on hybrid electric motor vehicles. Repeals the $64 annual license tax on hybrid electric motor vehicles that was first imposed beginning July 1, 2013. The bill also provides for refunds of the license tax paid on hybrid electric motor vehicles for registration years beginning on or after July 1, 2014.
Title
Hybrid electric motor vehicles; repeals annual license tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Marsden [D] | Sen. John Miller [D] | Sen. Stephen Newman [R] | Sen. John Petersen [D] |
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] | Sen. Frank Wagner [R] | Sen. Barbara Favola [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 7-N) (Y: 94 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 3-N) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 2-N) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 3-N) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 2-N) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0014) | |
2014-02-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 14 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB127ER) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 7-N) |
2014-02-19 | House | Passed House (92-Y 7-N) |
2014-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-17 | House | Reported from Finance (19-Y 2-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (35-Y 3-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 2-N) |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB127S1 |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104011D-S1 |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Incorporates SB506 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Incorporates SB221 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Incorporates SB159 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Incorporates SB38 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Incorporates SB1 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104011D-S1 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 5-N) |
2013-12-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101066D |
Same As/Similar To
HB975 (Same As) 2014-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0043)