VA SB110 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0818)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0818)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unemployment compensation; short-time compensation program. Establishes a short-time compensation program that provides employers with the option of reducing the hours worked by employees, while permitting the employees whose hours are reduced to receive partial compensation for lost wages. Program participation requires Virginia Employment Commission approval of a plan, which must provide that the reduction in hours of work is in lieu of a layoff of an equivalent percentage of employees and that employees' health and retirement benefits cannot be reduced or eliminated under the plan. An employer is not eligible to participate in the program if it has negative unemployment experience, is assigned the maximum experience rating tax rate, is assigned the tax rate for new employers, or reduced its workforce by 20 percent or more during the preceding six months. Participating employers are required to provide information regarding whether the plan is intended to be a transition to permanent layoffs. An individual who satisfies other requirements for unemployment benefits will be eligible for short-term compensation if he is available for the individual's usual hours of work with the participating employer, which may include participating in certain training programs. The measure requires the Commission to submit reports on the program's implementation and accomplishments, with recommendations to improve its effectiveness. The measure becomes effective January 1, 2015. The bill has an expiration date of January 1, 2020; however, if federal grants covering certain costs of establishing the program are not received by the Commission by July 1, 2016, the bill will expire on that date.
Title
Unemployment compensation; short-time compensation program, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (28-Y 65-N) (Y: 28 N: 67 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 8-N) (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 13-N) (Y: 87 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 8-N) (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 13-N) (Y: 87 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0818) | |
2014-05-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 818 (effective - see bill) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB110ER2) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Communicated to Governor |
2014-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted in-part | |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (28-Y 65-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation #6 (28-Y 65-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 8-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation #'s 1, 2, 3, 4, and 5 (86-Y 8-N) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-06 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB110ER) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Title replaced 14105520D-H1 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-04 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 13-N) |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed House with substitute (87-Y 13-N) |
2014-03-04 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB110H1 |
2014-03-04 | House | Substitute by Delegate Byron agreed to 14105520D-H1 |
2014-03-04 | House | Floor substitute printed 14105520D-H1 (Byron) |
2014-03-04 | House | Motion to reconsider pass by for the day agreed to |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-03-04 | House | Committee amendment rejected |
2014-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-25 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 5-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 14100878D-E |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB110E |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (10-Y 4-N) |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Introduced bill reprinted 14100878D |
2013-12-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-12-27 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100878D |