VA SB1 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on November 18 2013 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-15 - Incorporated by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Annual license tax on hybrid electric motor vehicles. Repeals the $64 annual license tax on hybrid electric motor vehicles that was first imposed beginning July 1, 2013. The bill also provides for refunds of the license tax paid on hybrid electric motor vehicles for registration years beginning on or after July 1, 2014.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hybrid electric motor vehicles; repeals annual license tax, refunds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-01-15 - Senate: Incorporated by Finance (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-15SenateIncorporated by Finance
2013-11-18SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2013-11-18SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100098D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5812249(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback