VA HR108 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 64-29)
Status: Passed on February 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-21 - Bill text as passed House (HR108ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 64-29)
Status: Passed on February 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-21 - Bill text as passed House (HR108ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Honorable Harry Burns Blevins.
Title
Commending the Honorable Harry Burns Blevins.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House (HR108ER) |
2014-02-21 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2014-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-10 | House | Introduced bill reprinted 14104502D |
2014-02-06 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 14104502D |