VA HJR88 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-23 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ88ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-23 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ88ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Colonel Frank Samuel Duling, Jr., former City of Richmond Chief of Police.
Title
Celebrating the life of Colonel Frank Samuel Duling, Jr., former City of Richmond Chief of Police.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ88ER) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Received |
2014-01-17 | House | Agreed to by House |
2014-01-17 | House | Engrossed by House |
2014-01-10 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-09 | House | Introduced bill reprinted 14100054D |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/08/14 14100054D |