VA HJR521 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ521ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ521ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia's Rail Heritage Region in the Commonwealth. Designates Virginia's Rail Heritage Region in the Commonwealth, consisting of the Counties of Alleghany, Amherst, Bedford, Botetourt, Campbell, Franklin, and Roanoke and the Cities of Covington, Lynchburg, Roanoke, and Salem, as well as the Towns of Amherst, Bedford, Boones Mill, Buchanan, Clifton Forge, Iron Gate, Rocky Mount, Troutville, and Vinton.
Title
Virginia's Rail Heritage Region; designating certain areas in the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ521ER) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reading waived |
2015-01-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House |
2015-01-28 | House | Taken up |
2015-01-23 | House | Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-12-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-12-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101901D |