VA HJR360 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Aaron S. Huff.
Title
Commending Aaron S. Huff.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | Left in Rules |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Reading waived |
2014-02-28 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2014-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House |
2014-02-24 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 14104759D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HJ360 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HJ360+hil |