VA HJR167 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ167ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ167ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Historic Smithfield Plantation. Designates Historic Smithfield Plantation in Blacksburg as "a Family Homestead of Virginia Governors."
Title
Historic Smithfield Plantation in Blacksburg; designating as Birthplace of Virginia Governors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ167ER) |
2014-03-06 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N) |
2014-03-06 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 1-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reading waived |
2014-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (92-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Printed as engrossed 14103882D-E |
2014-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HJ167E |
2014-02-05 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-02-05 | House | Taken up |
2014-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103882D |