VA HB933 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0667)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0667)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Update to child support guidelines. Provides for updated child support guidelines. The new guidelines specify obligors' monthly child support obligation on the basis of gross monthly income in increments up to $35,000, with an additional amount calculated as a percentage of gross monthly income above $35,000. The bill allows the court to set a support obligation below the presumptive statutory minimum for obligors who earn up to 150 percent of the federal poverty level, provided that such lower amount does not seriously impair the custodial parent's ability to maintain minimal adequate housing and provide other basic necessities for the child. The bill also removes the $250 floor on reasonable and necessary unreimbursed medical or dental expenses that parents are required to pay in proportion to their gross incomes. This bill is a recommendation of the Child Support Guidelines Review Panel.
Title
Child support; update to guidelines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 10-N) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 10-N) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0667) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 667 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB933ER) |
2014-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 10-N) |
2014-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House (85-Y 10-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Printed as engrossed 14102800D-E |
2014-01-23 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB933E |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-01-23 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 5-N) |
2014-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102800D |