VA HB925 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0666)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0666)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Driver education instructors. Allows community colleges to offer courses required to become driver education instructors.
Title
Driver education; community colleges shall have authority to offer courses to become instructor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0666) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 666 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB925ER) |
2014-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Printed as engrossed 14103248D-E |
2014-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB925E |
2014-02-03 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-30 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103248D |
Same As/Similar To
SB554 (Same As) 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0753)