VA HB882 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0787)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0787)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; sale of cider in certain containers. Allows cider containing less than seven percent of alcohol to be sold in any containers that comply with federal regulations for wine or beer and cider containing seven percent or more of alcohol to be sold in any containers that comply with federal regulations for wine.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; sale of cider in any size containers allowable for wine, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Matt Fariss [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0787) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Enacted, Chapter 787 (effective 7/1/14) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB882ER2) |
2014-04-23 | House | Reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 1-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (93-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-06 | House | Governor's substitute printed 14105767D-H1 |
2014-04-06 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB882ER) |
2014-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Printed as engrossed 14102051D-E |
2014-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB882E |
2014-01-22 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-16 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102051D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 1 | 213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 324 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |