VA HB750 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on February 8 2012 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (11-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Inherent authority to defer and dismiss a criminal case. Provides that no court shall have the authority, upon a plea of guilty or nolo contendere or after a plea of not guilty, when the facts found by the court would justify a finding of guilt, to defer proceedings or to defer entry of a final order of guilt or to dismiss the case upon completion of terms and conditions except as provided by statute unless all parties agree otherwise or deferred judgment is provided for by statute. This bill responds to the January 13, 2011, Supreme Court of Virginia decision in Hernandez v. Commonwealth, 281 Va. 222, 707 S.E.2d 273 (2011).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Inherent authority; deferred disposition in criminal case.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-02 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N) (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-02 Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (11-Y 3-N)
2012-02-10 Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2012-02-10 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed
2012-02-09 House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N)
2012-02-09 House: Read third time and passed House (72-Y 26-N)
2012-02-08 House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB750H1
2012-02-08 House: Committee substitute agreed to 12104420D-H1
2012-02-08 House: Read second time
2012-02-07 House: Read first time
2012-02-06 House: Incorporates HB51
2012-02-03 House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 3-N)
2012-02-03 House: Committee substitute printed 12104420D-H1
2012-01-23 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 2-N)
2012-01-16 House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
2012-01-11 House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2012-01-11 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100320D

Same As/Similar To

HB51 (Similar To) 2012-01-30 - House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192298.02(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback