VA HB721 | 2008 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progress
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0855)

Summary

Approval of plats, site plans, and plans of development in certain localities. Creates a more compact approval process for commercial property in localities with a population greater than 90,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Plats; approval process by local planning commission.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2008-04-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0855)
2008-04-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 855 (effective 7/1/08)
2008-04-23 Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled
2008-04-23 House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
2008-04-23 House: Reenrolled bill text (HB721ER2)
2008-04-23 House: Reenrolled
2008-04-23 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2008-04-23 Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
2008-04-23 House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N)
2008-04-23 House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 3-N)
2008-04-22 House: Placed on Calendar
2008-04-11 House: Governor's recommendation received by House
2008-03-09 Senate: Signed by President
2008-03-07 House: Signed by Speaker
2008-03-07 House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB721ER)
2008-03-07 House: Enrolled
2008-03-05 House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (85-Y 5-N)
2008-03-05 House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (85-Y 5-N)
2008-03-04 House: Placed on Calendar
2008-03-03 Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 1-N)
2008-03-03 Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2008-03-03 Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (37-Y 0-N)
2008-03-03 Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended
2008-03-03 Senate: Committee amendments agreed to
2008-03-03 Senate: Reading of amendments waived
2008-03-03 Senate: Read third time
2008-02-29 Senate: Passed by for the day
2008-02-28 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2008-02-26 Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (10-Y 5-N)
2008-02-07 Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government
2008-02-07 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed
2008-02-06 House: Communicated to Senate
2008-02-06 House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N)
2008-02-06 House: Read third time and passed House (95-Y 4-N)
2008-02-05 House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB721H1
2008-02-05 House: Committee substitute agreed to 082052668-H1
2008-02-05 House: Read second time
2008-02-04 House: Read first time
2008-02-01 House: Committee substitute printed 082052668-H1
2008-02-01 House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
2008-01-08 House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2008-01-08 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 082220544

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback