VA HB62 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0727)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Disposal of solid waste fees; Southampton County. Allows Southampton County to levy fees for the disposal of solid waste at a county collection or disposal facility not to exceed the actual cost incurred by the county in removing and disposing of solid waste. The bill adds Southampton County to the list of counties permitted to use fees to purchase equipment; grants Southampton County the same authority that Accomack, Highland, Pittsylvania, and Wise Counties have regarding such fees; and allows Southampton County to exempt certain disabled veterans from such fees. The bill also makes technical changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disposal of solid waste fees; Southampton County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-28 - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-06 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0727)
2014-04-06 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 727 (effective 7/1/14)
2014-03-08SenateSigned by President
2014-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2014-03-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB62ER)
2014-03-05HouseEnrolled
2014-02-28SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2014-02-28SenateRead third time
2014-02-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2014-02-25SenateReported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
2014-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2014-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2014-02-11HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
2014-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N)
2014-02-10HousePrinted as engrossed 14100985D-E
2014-02-10HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB62E
2014-02-10HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2014-02-10HouseRead second time
2014-02-08HouseRead first time
2014-02-07HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2014-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
2014-01-09HouseAssigned CC & T sub: #1
2013-12-05HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2013-12-05HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100985D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522159(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+sum+HB62
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+ful+HB62+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+ful+HB62E+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+ful+HB62ER+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+ful+CHAP0727+hil
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+vot+H0701V0042+HB0062
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+vot+H07V0062+HB0062
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+vot+HV0694+HB0062
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+vot+S07V0081+HB0062
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+vot+SV0644HB0062+HB0062
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?141+vot+SV0666HB0062+HB0062

Bill Comments

feedback