VA HB375 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0810)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0810)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Patent infringement; assertions made in bad faith. Prohibits any person from making in bad faith an assertion of patent infringement. The Attorney General or an attorney for the Commonwealth is empowered to accept assurances of voluntary compliance and seek injunctive relief. The Attorney General is authorized to issue civil investigative demands. The measure does not create a private cause of action. The measure does not apply to a demand letter or assertion of patent infringement that includes a claim for relief arising under 35 U.S.C. § 271(e)(2) or 42 U.S.C. § 262.
Title
Patent infringement; assertions made in bad faith, exemptions, penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (27-Y 70-N) (Y: 27 N: 72 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0810) | |
2014-05-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 810 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Communicated to Governor |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (27-Y 70-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation (27-Y 70-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | Pending question ordered |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-04 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB375ER) |
2014-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 14105047D-S1 (93-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB375S1 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14105047D-S1 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14105047D-S1 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB375H2 |
2014-01-29 | House | Substitute by Delegate O'Quinn agreed to 14104519D-H2 |
2014-01-29 | House | Committee substitute rejected 14104358D-H1 |
2014-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-29 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2014-01-28 | House | Floor substitute printed 14104519D-H2 (O'Quinn) |
2014-01-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104358D-H1 |
2014-01-23 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (17-Y 4-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2014-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103256D |
Same As/Similar To
SB375 (Same As) 2014-01-22 - Stricken at request of Patron in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
SB150 (Same As) 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0819)
SB150 (Same As) 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0819)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 215.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 215.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |