VA HB331 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
First-time home buyer savings plans. Establishes first-time home buyer savings accounts that are to be used for saving funds for the purchase of homes by first-time home buyers. Moneys in the account are required to be used solely for the down payment and closing costs for the purchase of a home by a first-time home buyer. The bill establishes an individual income tax subtraction for income earned on contributions to the account. However, if moneys are withdrawn from the account for purposes other than to pay eligible costs, any income previously subtracted would be subject to recapture by the Commonwealth and a five percent penalty would be imposed. There would be no recapture and addition to taxable income if the amounts withdrawn were (i) withdrawn because of the death or disability of the account beneficiary, (ii) a disbursement of assets pursuant to a filing for protection under federal bankruptcy laws, or (iii) transferred to another first-time home buyer savings account. The bill limits the amount of principal that can be contributed to any account to $50,000 and limits the total amount that can be retained in an account at any time to $150,000. Persons would be allowed to contribute only cash or marketable securities to a first-time home buyer savings account. This bill as introduced was a recommendation of the Virginia Housing Commission.
Title
First-time home buyer savings plans; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 729 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB331ER) |
2014-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance (12-Y 4-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB331H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104599D-H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-06 | House | Passed by until Monday, February 10, 2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104599D-H1 |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned App. sub: Agriculture, Commerce, Technology and Natural Resources |
2014-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102606D |