VA HB325 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0755)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Students with autism spectrum disorders; training required of personnel. Requires each school board, by September 1, 2014, to ensure that aides assigned to work with a teacher who has primary oversight of students with autism spectrum disorders receive training in student behavioral management within 60 days of assignment to such responsibility. School boards may provide such training to other employees, including transportation employees. The Board of Education, in consultation with Virginia Commonwealth University, will develop online training that school divisions may use to fulfill these requirements. Such training shall be made available to local school divisions free of charge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Students with autism spectrum disorders; school board to require training of personnel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-18 - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0755)
2012-04-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 755 (effective 7/1/12)
2012-04-18 Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled
2012-04-18 House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
2012-04-18 House: Reenrolled bill text (HB325ER2)
2012-04-18 House: Reenrolled
2012-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2012-04-18 Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
2012-04-18 House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
2012-04-18 House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (93-Y 0-N)
2012-04-17 House: Placed on Calendar
2012-04-09 House: Governor's recommendation received by House
2012-03-10 Senate: Signed by President
2012-03-10 House: Signed by Speaker
2012-03-10 House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB325ER)
2012-03-10 House: Enrolled
2012-03-08 House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2012-03-08 House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 12105947D-S1 (97-Y 0-N)
2012-03-07 House: Placed on Calendar
2012-03-06 Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2012-03-06 Senate: Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB325S1
2012-03-06 Senate: Substitute by Senator Newman agreed to 12105947D-S1
2012-03-06 Senate: Reading of substitute waived
2012-03-06 Senate: Floor substitute printed 12105947D-S1 (Newman)
2012-03-06 Senate: Read third time
2012-03-05 Senate: Passed by for the day
2012-03-05 Senate: Read third time
2012-03-02 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2012-03-01 Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N)
2012-02-15 Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health
2012-02-15 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed
2012-02-14 House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
2012-02-14 House: Read third time and passed House (99-Y 1-N)
2012-02-13 House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB325H2
2012-02-13 House: Appropriations Committee substitute agreed to 12105336D-H2
2012-02-13 House: Education Committee substitute rejected 12104710D-H1
2012-02-13 House: Read second time
2012-02-12 House: Read first time
2012-02-10 House: Committee substitute printed 12105336D-H2
2012-02-10 House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2012-02-09 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
2012-02-06 House: Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2012-02-06 House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2012-02-06 House: Committee substitute printed 12104710D-H1
2012-02-06 House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
2012-02-02 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 1-N)
2012-01-13 House: Assigned Education sub: Teachers and Admin. Action
2012-01-10 House: Referred to Committee on Education
2012-01-10 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103151D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+sum+HB325
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+ful+HB325+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+ful+HB325H1+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+ful+HB325H2+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+ful+HB325S1+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+ful+HB325ER+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+ful+HB325ER2+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+ful+CHAP0755+hil
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+vot+H0903V0015+HB0325
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+vot+H09V0049+HB0325
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+vot+H0204V0015+HB0325
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+vot+H02V0088+HB0325
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+vot+HV0762+HB0325
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+vot+S04V0182+HB0325
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+vot+SV0861HB0325+HB0325
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+vot+SV0942HB0325+HB0325
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+vot+HV1457+HB0325
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+vot+HV1587+HB0325
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?121+vot+SV1165HB0325+HB0325

Bill Comments

feedback