VA HB324 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-27 - Continued to 2015 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-27 - Continued to 2015 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Virtual School established. Establishes the Board of the Virginia Virtual School as a policy agency in the executive branch of state government for the purpose of governing the online educational programs and services offered to students enrolled in the Virginia Virtual School. The Secretary of Education is responsible for such agency. The 13-member Board is given operational control of the School and assigned powers and duties. The bill requires the School to be open to any school-age person in the Commonwealth and provide an educational program meeting the Standards of Quality for grades kindergarten through 12. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2015.
Title
Virginia Virtual School; established, report, effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2015 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Senate | Continued to 2015 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (64-Y 34-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Printed as engrossed 14100834D-E |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB324E |
2014-02-10 | House | Pending question ordered |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendments (18-Y 3-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-05 | House | Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Reform |
2014-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100834D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 212.23 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 349.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 349.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 638 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |