VA HB285 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0779)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0779)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency protective orders; arrests for certain offenses. Includes special conservators of the peace who have met the certification requirements for a law-enforcement officer in the definition of a law-enforcement officer for the purposes of obtaining an emergency protective order and for making arrests for assault and battery against a household member, stalking, and violation of a protective order.
Title
Emergency protective orders; arrests for domestic assault, definition of law-enforcement officer.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] | Del. Chris Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0779) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Enacted, Chapter 779 (effective 7/1/14) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB285ER2) |
2014-04-23 | House | Reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-07 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB285ER) |
2014-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 14105113D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB285S1 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14105113D-S1 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14105113D-S1 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB285H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104016D-H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104016D-H1 |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2013-12-31 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-12-31 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103122D |
Same As/Similar To
SB71 (Same As) 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 253.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 81.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |