VA HB259 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-23 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-23 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
House of Delegates districts; technical adjustments. Makes technical changes in House of Delegates Districts 2, 7, 8, 9, 10, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 22, 23, 25, 26, 29, 30, 31, 32, 33, 42, 43, 44, 45, 47, 49, 50, 51, 52, 55, 59, 60, 64, 67, 75, 87, and 99 in order to eliminate split voting precincts and otherwise facilitate administration of legislative elections by local officials. All districts remain within one percent deviation of the ideal population. The bill incorporates HB 295, HB 574, HB 808, and HB 838.
Title
House of Delegates Districts; technical adjustments in boundaries.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Motion to Pass by for the day rejected (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Watkins agreed to 13104262D-S3 (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Motion to recommit to committee rejected (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Motion to reconsider vote to recommit to committee agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Motion to recommit to committee rejected (17-Y 22-N) (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-11-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute 12105683D-S1 (8-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Motion to Pass by for the day rejected (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Watkins agreed to 13104262D-S3 (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Motion to recommit to committee rejected (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Motion to reconsider vote to recommit to committee agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Motion to recommit to committee rejected (17-Y 22-N) (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-11-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute 12105683D-S1 (8-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-23 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2013-02-23 | House | No further action taken |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Chair ruled not properly before the Senate |
2013-02-06 | House | Speaker ruled Senate Substitute not germane |
2013-01-31 | House | Passed by until Wednesday, February 6th |
2013-01-29 | House | Passed by until Thursday, January 31st |
2013-01-24 | House | Passed by until Tuesday, January 29th |
2013-01-23 | House | Passed by for the day |
2013-01-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 19-N) |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB259S3 |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Motion to Pass by for the day rejected (19-Y 20-N) |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Watkins agreed to 13104262D-S3 (20-Y 19-N) |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 13104262D-S3 (Watkins) |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee rejected (19-Y 20-N) |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote to recommit to committee agreed to (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee rejected (17-Y 22-N) |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 12105683D-S1 |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2013-01-11 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2012-11-26 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Continued to 2013 in Privileges and Elections |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 20(g) |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Recommitted to Privileges and Elections |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 12105957D-S2 (Obenshain) |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Read third time |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2012-03-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2012-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 12105683D-S1 |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 7-N) |
2012-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2012-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2012-02-14 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2012-02-14 | House | Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2012-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB259H1 |
2012-02-13 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 12105339D-H1 |
2012-02-13 | House | Substitute by Delegate Cole withdrawn 12105410D-H2 |
2012-02-13 | House | Floor substitute printed 12105410D-H2 (Cole) |
2012-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2012-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2012-02-10 | House | Incorporates HB295 |
2012-02-10 | House | Incorporates HB808 |
2012-02-10 | House | Incorporates HB574 |
2012-02-10 | House | Incorporates HB838 |
2012-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 12105339D-H1 |
2012-02-10 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2012-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2012-01-12 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee |
2012-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2012-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100459D |
Same As/Similar To
HB295 (Similar To)