VA HB2484 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progress, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Standards of Quality; apportionment of state and local share. Directs the General Assembly, in apportioning the state and local share for the costs of meeting the Standards of Quality, beginning July 1, 2011, to implement a formula that determines each locality's ability to pay based on the ratios of (i) the reimbursement payment made to the locality for providing tangible personal property tax relief to the reimbursement payments made statewide for providing tangible personal property tax relief; (ii) the total value of real estate in the locality adjusted by the index used for the pay differential for state employees residing in that locality to the statewide value of real estate per person; (iii) the median value of residential real estate in the locality adjusted by the index used for the pay differential for state employees residing in that locality to the statewide median value of residential real estate; (iv) sales subject to the state sales tax in the locality to the statewide sales subject to the state sales tax; (v) revenue collected from the local personal property tax to the revenue collected statewide from the local personal property tax; and (vi) revenue collected from local lodging, local cigarette, and local meals taxes to the revenue collected statewide from these local lodging, cigarette, and meals taxes, as provided in the appropriation act. To determine each locality's composite index of ability to pay, (a) the sum of the ratios calculated on the basis of average daily membership for each locality shall be divided by the sum of the average daily membership ratios for all localities; (b) the sum of the ratios calculated on a per capita basis for each locality shall be divided by the sum of the per capita ratios for all localities; and (c) the locality's ratio calculated on the basis of average daily membership shall be multiplied by 0.66 and the locality's ratio calculated on a per capita basis shall be multiplied by 0.33. The sum of the two adjusted ratios in clause (c) shall be the local composite index of ability to pay.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Standards of Quality; apportionment of state and local share.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-08 House: Left in Appropriations
2011-02-01 House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2011-01-24 House: Assigned App. sub: Elementary and Secondary
2011-01-21 House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2011-01-21 House: Presented and ordered printed 11102587D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221253.13:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback