VA HB218 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Purchase, etc., of tobacco products by minors; nicotine vapor products and alternative nicotine products. Adds nicotine vapor products and alternative nicotine products to the list of tobacco products that cannot be sold to or purchased or possessed by a minor. The bill defines a nicotine vapor product as a noncombustible product containing nicotine that employs a heating element, power source, electronic circuit, or other means that can be used to produce vapor from nicotine in a solution or other form. The bill defines an alternative nicotine product as any noncombustible product containing nicotine that is intended for human consumption.
Title
Tobacco products; purchase, etc., of nicotine vapor products by minors, penalty.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] | Del. Thomas Rust [R] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Scott Garrett [R] |
Del. Thomas Greason [R] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Keith Hodges [R] | Del. David Ramadan [R] |
Del. David Yancey [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 394 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB218ER) |
2014-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB218H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104514D-H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Incorporates HB26 |
2014-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104514D-H1 |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2013-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100803D |
Same As/Similar To
HB26 (Similar To) 2014-01-20 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
SB96 (Same As) 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357)
SB96 (Same As) 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357)