VA HB206 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0750)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0750)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real Estate Board; duties of real estate brokers and salespersons. Requires the Real Estate Board to establish procedures for carrying over continuing education credits by real estate licensees. The bill also (i) authorizes the Board to regulate the permitted activities of unlicensed individuals employed by licensees or under the supervision of a broker; (ii) requires brokers to certify that their brokerage firms or sole proprietorships have been audited for compliance with real estate law and Board regulations; (iii) sets out duties for supervising brokers at each branch location with regard to supervising/training associate brokers and salespersons; (iv) clarifies the term "independent contractor"; (v) provides that licensees are not required to disclose whether an attorney or nonattorney will be providing settlement services; (vi) combines dual agency and dual representation disclosure forms for residential and commercial properties; and (vii) makes several changes to terminology related to dual and designated representation and agency relationships. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Real Estate Board; continuing education, duties of real estate brokers and salespersons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0750) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 750 (effective - see bill) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB206ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB206ER) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-05 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 12105637D-S1 (97-Y 0-N | |
2012-03-02 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB206S1 | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105637D-S1 | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105637D-S1 | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-01 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-01 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | House: Printed as engrossed 12103815D-E | |
2012-01-31 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB206E | |
2012-01-31 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-01-31 | House: Read second time | |
2012-01-30 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-26 | House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing | |
2012-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103815D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Educational Institutions
Professions and Occupations
Real Estate and Real Estate Tax
Educational Institutions
Professions and Occupations
Real Estate and Real Estate Tax
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2105.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2106.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2106.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2110.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2134 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2137 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2138 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2138.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2139 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2139.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2139.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2139.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2141 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |