VA HB2010 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progress
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0548)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Southwest Virginia Cultural Heritage Foundation. Creates the Southwest Virginia Cultural Heritage Foundation to replace the Southwest Virginia Cultural Heritage Commission, which will cease to exist on July 1, 2011. The bill sets out the membership and powers and duties of the Foundation. The bill provides that the Southwest Virginia Cultural Heritage Foundation is the successor in interest to the Southwest Virginia Cultural Heritage Commission, removes the Chancellor of the Virginia Community College System, and provides that members of the Commission serving terms shall continue their terms as members of the board of trustees of the Southwest Virginia Cultural Heritage Foundation. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Southwest Virginia Cultural Heritage Foundation; created.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-23 - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate: Reconsideration of dispensing with constitutional reading agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate: Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0548)
2011-03-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 548 (effective 7/1/11)
2011-03-06 Senate: Signed by President
2011-03-03 House: Signed by Speaker
2011-03-03 House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2010ER)
2011-03-03 House: Enrolled
2011-02-23 House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2011-02-23 House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
2011-02-22 House: Placed on Calendar
2011-02-22 Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-22 Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended
2011-02-22 Senate: Committee amendments agreed to
2011-02-22 Senate: Reading of amendments waived
2011-02-22 Senate: Read third time
2011-02-21 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2011-02-21 Senate: Reconsideration of dispensing with constitutional reading agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-21 Senate: Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-21 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2011-02-18 Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2011-02-14 Senate: Assigned Rules sub: #1
2011-02-03 Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules
2011-02-03 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed
2011-02-02 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2011-02-02 House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2011-02-01 House: Read second time and engrossed
2011-01-31 House: Read first time
2011-01-27 House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2011-01-25 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2011-01-17 House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
2011-01-11 House: Referred to Committee on General Laws
2011-01-11 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103562D

Same As/Similar To

SB893 (Same As) 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0521)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222101(n/a)See Bill Text
222734(n/a)See Bill Text
222737(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+sum+HB2010
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+ful+HB2010+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+ful+HB2010ER+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+ful+CHAP0548+hil
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+vot+H1104V0013+HB2010
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+vot+H11V0065+HB2010
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+vot+HV0381+HB2010
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+vot+S10V0064+HB2010
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+vot+SV0578HB2010+HB2010
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+vot+SV0579HB2010+HB2010
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+vot+SV0580HB2010+HB2010
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+vot+SV0581HB2010+HB2010
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+vot+SV0602HB2010+HB2010
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?111+vot+HV1348+HB2010

Bill Comments

feedback