VA HB17 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0388)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0388)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Warrant requirement for certain telecommunications records; real-time location data. Provides that a provider of electronic communication service or remote computing service shall not disclose real-time location data to an investigative or law-enforcement officer except pursuant to a search warrant, subject to certain exceptions. The bill defines "real-time location data" as data or information concerning the current location of an electronic device that is generated, derived from, or obtained by the operation of the device.
Title
Electronic communication or remote computing devices; warrant requirement for certain records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0388) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 388 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB17ER) |
2014-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-28 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-28 | House | Senate substitute with amendment agreed to by House 14105228D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reconsideration of House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB17S1 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Amendment by Senator McEachin agreed to |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14105228D-S1 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14105228D-S1 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB17H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104361D-H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-10 | House | Incorporates HB817 |
2014-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104361D-H1 |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2013-11-20 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-11-20 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100125D |
Same As/Similar To
HB817 (Similar To) 2014-02-07 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 152.17 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 56.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 70.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |