VA HB1645 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0738)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Board for Contractors; tradesmen licenses. Provides that licenses for tradesmen shall be valid for three years from the date of issuance by the Board for Contractors. This measure is an attempt to sync changes to the Uniform Statewide Building Code, which are on a three-year cycle, to the expiration of a tradesman license, which is currently every two years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tradesmen; Board for Contractors shall evaluate continuing education requirements, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-03 - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-03 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0738)
2013-04-03 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 738 (effective 7/1/13)
2013-04-03SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2013-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2013-04-03HouseReenrolled bill text (HB1645ER2)
2013-04-03HouseReenrolled
2013-04-03 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2013-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2013-04-03HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2013-04-03HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
2013-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2013-03-19HouseGovernor's substitute printed 13105621D-H1
2013-03-19HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2013-02-20SenateSigned by President
2013-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1645ER)
2013-02-20HouseEnrolled
2013-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2013-02-14SenateRead third time
2013-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2013-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2013-01-24SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2013-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2013-01-23HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2013-01-23HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2013-01-22HouseRead second time and engrossed
2013-01-21HouseRead first time
2013-01-17HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2013-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2013-01-14HouseAssigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
2013-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2013-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100042D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5411132(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?131+sum+HB1645
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?131+ful+HB1645+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?131+ful+HB1645ER+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?131+ful+HB1645H1+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?131+ful+HB1645ER2+hil
Texthttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?131+ful+CHAP0738+hil
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?131+vot+H1104V0004+HB1645
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?131+vot+H11V0031+HB1645
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?131+vot+H11V0048+HB1645
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?131+vot+HV0189+HB1645
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?131+vot+S12V0111+HB1645
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?131+vot+SV0491HB1645+HB1645
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?131+vot+SV0530HB1645+HB1645
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?131+vot+HV1346+HB1645
Roll Callhttp://leg1.state.va.us/cgi-bin/legp504.exe?131+vot+SV1010HB1645+HB1645

Bill Comments

feedback