VA HB1407 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Allocation of funds for state secondary highways. Allocates 10 percent of state revenues allocated to state secondary highways for use in reconstructing deteriorated state secondary highway pavements. The bill reduces from 25 to 20 percent the share of such revenues currently allocated to advancing high-priority projects statewide and reduces from 15 to 10 percent the share of such revenues currently allocated to projects undertaken pursuant to the Public-Private Transportation Act of 1995.
Title
State secondary highways; allocation of 10 per cent of funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | House | Left in Transportation |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2014-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-12-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102011D |