VA HB1398 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0256)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0256)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revision of Title 33. Corrects typographical errors and other mistakes from the revision and recodification of Title 33. The bill also implements clarifying changes and other changes made in the revision and recodification of Title 33.2. The bill also repeals the Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact, which is not in effect, and reinserts language that was omitted from Chapter 805 of the Acts of Assembly of 2014 and provides that the reinsertion is effective retroactively to October 1, 2014. The bill also relocates the Williamsburg Area Transit Authority from Title 15.2 to Title 33.2 and includes necessary savings clauses for this renumbering and relocation. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Code Commission.
Title
Highways, bridges, and ferries; clarification of certain revisions to Title 33.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0256) | |
2015-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 256 (effective - see bill) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1398ER) |
2015-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-20 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-12-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-12-16 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100605D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 6800 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 6809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 1024 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 1025 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 1027 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 117 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 1230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 1300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 1509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 1726 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 1915 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 1929 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 2103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 2205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 2216 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 2217 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 2300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 2915 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 2916 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 321 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 3300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 3308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 612 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 613 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |