VA HB1308 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0672)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0672)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Right to privacy in electronic communications; confidential relationship; civil action. Doubles the amount of liquidated damages that may be recovered against a person who intercepts, discloses, or uses wire, electronic, or oral communications in violation of Virginia's wiretapping law if such communications are between (i) a husband and wife; (ii) an attorney and client; (iii) a licensed practitioner of the healing arts and patient; (iv) a licensed professional counselor, licensed clinical social worker, licensed psychologist, or licensed marriage and family therapist and client; or (v) a clergy member and person seeking spiritual counsel or advice. The bill increases the allowable liquidated damages from $400 a day for each day of violation or $4,000, whichever is higher, to $800 a day or $8,000, whichever is higher.
Title
Wire, electronic, or oral communications; civil action for unlawful interception, disclosure, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Robert Marshall [R] | Del. Mark Berg [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0672) | |
2015-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 672 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/24/15 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1308ER) |
2015-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1308H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104020D-H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104020D-H1 |
2015-01-28 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-11-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-11-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100035D |